Refine your search

Date Major Actions
07/09/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-144.
07/09/2012 Signed by President.
06/28/2012 Presented to President.
06/26/2012 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to the bill (S. 3187) by Yea-Nay Vote. 92 - 4. Record Vote Number: 168.(consideration: CR S4626)
06/20/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3825-3861)
05/24/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 1. Record Vote Number: 111.(text: CR S3568-3608)
05/15/2012 Introduced in Senate