Refine your search

Date Major Actions
10/05/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-194.
10/05/2012 Signed by President.
09/25/2012 Presented to President.
09/22/2012 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6672)
08/01/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 7/31/2012 H5411-5412)
01/27/2012 Committee on Armed Services discharged.
01/27/2012 Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-376, Part I.
07/22/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4850-4852; text as passed Senate: CR S4850-4852)
07/18/2011 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with amendments. With written report No. 112-37.
02/08/2011 Introduced in Senate