Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/02/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/03/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/03/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/07/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/14/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/14/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/14/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/14/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/14/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/14/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/14/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/14/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/14/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/14/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/14/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/14/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/28/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/28/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/28/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/14/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/14/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/17/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/17/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/08/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/12/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/13/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/13/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/11/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/14/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/22/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/22/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/22/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/27/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/26/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/28/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/02/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/08/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/11/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/11/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 11/01/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/29/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/13/2012