Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/01/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/02/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/02/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/02/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/02/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/02/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/02/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/02/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/02/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/02/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/02/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/02/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/02/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/02/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/14/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/04/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/19/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/15/2011