Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 02/01/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/03/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/15/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/01/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 12/15/2011