Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/17/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/17/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/17/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/25/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/25/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/25/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/25/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/08/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/23/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/13/2012