Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/28/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/28/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/29/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/29/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/29/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/10/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/10/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/15/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/15/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/16/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/16/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/31/2012