Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/16/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/07/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/08/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/16/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/26/2012