Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/21/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/22/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/22/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/26/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/26/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/27/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/28/2012