Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 02/16/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 02/17/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/29/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/29/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/29/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/29/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/15/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/21/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/24/2012