Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/26/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/27/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/27/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/03/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/02/2011