Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/02/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/02/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/02/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/02/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/02/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/02/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/14/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/28/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/29/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/27/2012