Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 12/12/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 01/24/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/01/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/01/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/16/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/21/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/22/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/29/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/30/2012