Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/13/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/15/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 12/16/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/26/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/29/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/08/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/12/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/13/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/25/2012