Refine your search

Date Major Actions
11/27/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-200.
11/27/2012 Signed by President.
11/16/2012 Presented to President.
11/13/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6330-6331)
09/22/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 9/21/2012 S6612)
08/02/2012 Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-195.
12/07/2011 Introduced in Senate