Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 11/30/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 11/30/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 11/30/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/30/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/30/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/30/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/01/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/09/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/09/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/09/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/09/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/09/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/09/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/09/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/09/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/09/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/16/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/16/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/16/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/16/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/16/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/16/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/04/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/04/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/04/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/25/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/25/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/25/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/25/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/25/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/25/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/25/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/25/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/25/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/25/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/25/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/25/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/28/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/28/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/28/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/28/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/28/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/29/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/29/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/29/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/29/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/29/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/29/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/29/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/29/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/29/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/29/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/29/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/29/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/29/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/29/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/11/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/11/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/11/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/11/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/16/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/16/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/16/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/16/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/19/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/23/2012