Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 11/16/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 11/16/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/16/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/17/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/07/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/30/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/06/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/09/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/14/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/14/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/21/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/10/2012