Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.2056 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To modify the process for closing or consolidating post offices and postal facilities.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2056 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2637-2638)
  • S.Amdt.2043 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike the limitations on changes to mail delivery schedule, with an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2043, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 56. Record Vote Number: 72.
  • S.Amdt.2042 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To maintain current delivery time for market-dominant products.
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2042, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 54. Record Vote Number: 80.
  • S.Amdt.2036 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To express the sense of the Senate with respect to the closing and consolidation of postal facilities and post offices.
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2036 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2031 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit the closing of a rural post office unless certain conditions are met and to establish a moratorium on the closing of rural post offices.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2031 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2643)
  • S.Amdt.2020 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Postal Service to consider the effect of closing or consolidating a postal facility on the ability of the affected community to vote by mail and to provide for a moratorium on the closing or consolidation of post offices and postal facilities to protect the ability to vote by mail.
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2020 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2641)