Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/16/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/16/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/16/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/09/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/29/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/07/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/13/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/12/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/13/2012