Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/29/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/29/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/29/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/17/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/03/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/06/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/24/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/26/2012