Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/11/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/19/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/19/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/21/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/26/2012