Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/23/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/23/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/26/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/26/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/26/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/07/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/08/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/08/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/08/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/09/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/13/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/13/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/13/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/15/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/15/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/15/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/15/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/16/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/16/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/20/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/20/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/21/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/21/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/23/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/23/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/27/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/27/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/29/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/05/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/06/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/06/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/07/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/07/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/11/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/11/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/12/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/22/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/25/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/26/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/27/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/27/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/28/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/29/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/02/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/06/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/06/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/06/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/06/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/07/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/13/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/15/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/21/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/21/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 09/22/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/22/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/23/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/03/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 10/03/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/05/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/06/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 10/06/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/11/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 10/20/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/10/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/17/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/30/2011