Text: H.Res.99 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/17/2011)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 112th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 99 Introduced in House (IH)]

112th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 99

Recognizing the significance of the 65th anniversary of the signing of 
Executive Order 9066 by President Franklin D. Roosevelt and supporting 
   the goals of the Japanese American, German American, and Italian 
 American communities in recognizing a National Day of Remembrance to 
 increase public awareness of the events surrounding the restriction, 
exclusion, and internment of individuals and families during World War 
                                  II.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           February 17, 2011

    Ms. Chu (for herself, Ms. Bordallo, Mr. Al Green of Texas, Ms. 
Hanabusa, Ms. Hirono, Mr. Honda, Ms. Matsui, and Mr. Wu) submitted the 
   following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the 
                               Judiciary

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
Recognizing the significance of the 65th anniversary of the signing of 
Executive Order 9066 by President Franklin D. Roosevelt and supporting 
   the goals of the Japanese American, German American, and Italian 
 American communities in recognizing a National Day of Remembrance to 
 increase public awareness of the events surrounding the restriction, 
exclusion, and internment of individuals and families during World War 
                                  II.

Whereas President Franklin Delano Roosevelt signed Executive Order 9066 on 
        February 19, 1942, which authorized the exclusion of 120,000 Japanese 
        Americans and legal resident aliens from the west coast of the United 
        States and the internment of United States citizens and legal permanent 
        residents of Japanese ancestry in internment camps during World War II;
Whereas the freedom of Italian Americans and German Americans was also 
        restricted during World War II by measures that branded them enemy 
        aliens and included required identification cards, travel restrictions, 
        seizure of personal property, and internment;
Whereas President Gerald Ford formally rescinded Executive Order 9066 on 
        February 19, 1976, in his speech, ``An American Promise'';
Whereas Congress adopted legislation which was signed by President Jimmy Carter 
        on July 31, 1980, establishing the Commission on Wartime Relocation and 
        Internment of Civilians to investigate the claim that the incarceration 
        of Japanese Americans and legal resident aliens during World War II was 
        justified by military necessity;
Whereas the Commission held 20 days of hearings and heard from over 750 
        witnesses on this matter and published its findings in a report entitled 
        ``Personal Justice Denied'';
Whereas the conclusion of the commission was that the promulgation of Executive 
        Order 9066 was not justified by military necessity, and that the 
        decision to issue the order was shaped by ``race prejudice, war 
        hysteria, and a failure of political leadership'';
Whereas Congress enacted the Civil Liberties Act of 1988, in which it apologized 
        on behalf of the Nation for ``fundamental violations of the basic civil 
        liberties and constitutional rights of these individuals of Japanese 
        ancestry'';
Whereas President Ronald Reagan signed the Civil Liberties Act of 1988 into law 
        on August 10, 1988, proclaiming that day to be a ``great day for 
        America'';
Whereas the Civil Liberties Act of 1988 established the Civil Liberties Public 
        Education Fund, the purpose of which is ``to sponsor research and public 
        educational activities and to publish and distribute the hearings, 
        findings, and recommendations of the Commission on Wartime Relocation 
        and Internment of Civilians so that the events surrounding the 
        exclusion, forced removal, and internment of civilians and permanent 
        resident aliens of Japanese ancestry will be remembered, and so that the 
        causes and circumstances of this and similar events may be illuminated 
        and understood'';
Whereas Congress adopted the Wartime Violation of Italian Americans Civil 
        Liberties Act, which was signed by President Bill Clinton on November 7, 
        2000, and which resulted in a report containing detailed information on 
        the types of violations that occurred, as well as lists of individuals 
        of Italian ancestry that were arrested, detained, and interned;
Whereas the Japanese American community recognizes a National Day of Remembrance 
        on February 19th of each year to educate the public about the lessons 
        learned from the internment to ensure that it never happens again;
Whereas H.R. 1492 (Public Law 109-441) was passed by Congress and signed into 
        law in 2006, to allow the Government to identify and acquire sites used 
        to confine Japanese Americans during World War II, in order to preserve 
        and maintain these historic locations for posterity and inspire new 
        generations of Americans to work for justice while demonstrating the 
        Nation's commitment to equal and fair treatment for all; and
Whereas the Day of Remembrance provides an opportunity for all people to reflect 
        on the importance of political leadership and vigilance and on the 
        values of justice and civil rights during times of uncertainty and 
        emergency: Now, therefore, be it:
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) recognizes the historical significance of February 19, 
        1942, the date Executive Order 9066 was signed by President 
        Roosevelt, restricting the freedom of Japanese Americans, 
        German Americans, and Italian Americans, and legal resident 
        aliens through required identification cards, travel 
        restrictions, seizure of personal property, and internment; and
            (2) supports the goals of the Japanese American, German 
        American, and Italian American communities in recognizing a 
        National Day of Remembrance to increase public awareness of 
        these events.
                                 <all>