Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/10/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/10/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/10/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/07/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/07/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/07/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/12/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/12/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/15/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/06/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/06/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/13/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/25/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/25/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 12/20/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/18/2012