Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 12/17/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/18/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/18/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/18/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/18/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/18/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/18/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/18/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/18/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/18/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/18/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/18/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/18/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/18/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/18/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/18/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/18/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/18/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/18/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/18/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/18/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 12/18/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/18/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/18/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/18/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 12/19/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/19/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/19/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/19/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/19/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/19/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/19/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/19/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/19/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 12/19/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/19/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 12/19/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/19/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/19/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 12/19/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/19/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 12/19/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 12/19/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/19/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/19/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/19/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/19/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/19/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/19/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/19/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/19/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/19/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/19/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/19/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/20/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 12/20/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/20/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/20/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/20/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/20/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/20/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/20/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/20/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/20/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/20/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/20/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 12/20/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/20/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/20/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/20/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/20/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/20/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/20/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 12/20/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/31/2012