Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/05/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/05/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 12/07/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/07/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/07/2012
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 12/07/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 12/07/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 12/07/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/07/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/07/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/12/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/12/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/12/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/12/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/12/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/12/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/12/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/12/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/12/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/12/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/13/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/13/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/20/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/20/2012