Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/04/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/04/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/11/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/11/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/11/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/11/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/11/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/11/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/11/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/11/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/11/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/12/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 12/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/18/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/18/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/18/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/19/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/19/2012