Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/16/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/27/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/27/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/27/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/27/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/27/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 11/28/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/28/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/28/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/03/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/03/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2012