Text: H.Res.784 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/13/2012)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 112th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 784 Introduced in House (IH)]

112th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 784

 Celebrating the life and achievements of Neil A. Armstrong, a United 
States patriot who humbly and selflessly served his country, State, and 
   community as a naval aviator, test pilot, astronaut, aeronautical 
            engineer, university professor, and businessman.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           September 13, 2012

Mrs. Schmidt (for herself, Mr. Chabot, Mr. Turner of Ohio, Mr. Jordan, 
 Mr. Latta, Mr. Johnson of Ohio, Mr. Austria, Mr. Boehner, Ms. Kaptur, 
 Mr. Kucinich, Ms. Fudge, Mr. Tiberi, Ms. Sutton, Mr. LaTourette, Mr. 
   Stivers, Mr. Renacci, Mr. Ryan of Ohio, Mr. Gibbs, and Mr. Hall) 
submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee 
                   on Science, Space, and Technology

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Celebrating the life and achievements of Neil A. Armstrong, a United 
States patriot who humbly and selflessly served his country, State, and 
   community as a naval aviator, test pilot, astronaut, aeronautical 
            engineer, university professor, and businessman.

Whereas Neil A. Armstrong was born on August 5, 1930, in Wapakoneta, Ohio;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong earned his flight certificate at 16 years of age;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong was a Boy Scout and earned the rank of Eagle Scout;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong graduated from Blume High School in 1947;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong served as a naval aviator from 1949 to 1952;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong flew 78 combat missions in the Korean War;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong graduated from Purdue University in 1955 with a 
        Bachelor of Science degree in aeronautical engineering;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong worked for the National Advisory Committee for 
        Aeronautics (NACA) in 1955;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong flew over 200 models of aircraft, from gliders to 
        jets, as a research pilot at the National Aeronautics and Space 
        Administration's (NASA) Flight Research Center at Edwards Air Force 
        Base, California;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong joined the NASA Astronaut Corp in 1962;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong was assigned as the command pilot for the Gemini 8 
        mission, which was launched on March 16, 1966;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong, as the command pilot for the Gemini 8 mission, became 
        the first person to successfully navigate the docking of two vehicles in 
        space;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong was assigned as the spacecraft commander for the 
        Apollo 11 mission, which was launched on July 16, 1969, and which was 
        the first manned lunar landing mission;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong, as the spacecraft commander for the Apollo 11 
        mission, became the first person, on July 20, 1969, to step onto the 
        lunar surface;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong, upon becoming the first person to walk on the moon 
        uttered those famous words, ``That's one small step for [a] man, one 
        giant leap for mankind'';
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong graduated from the University of Southern California 
        in 1970 with a Master of Science degree in aerospace engineering;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong served as the Deputy Associate Administrator for 
        Aeronautics in the Office of Advanced Research and Technology, NASA 
        Headquarters, Washington, DC;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong served NACA and its successor agency, NASA, as an 
        aeronautical engineer, test pilot, astronaut, and administrator;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong taught at the University of Cincinnati from 1971 to 
        1979 as a Professor of Aerospace Engineering;
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong served as the chairman of Computing Technologies for 
        Aviation, Inc. in Charlottesville, Virginia, from 1982 to 1992; and
Whereas Neil A. Armstrong was the recipient of many awards and honors, including 
        the Presidential Medal of Freedom, the Congressional Gold Medal, the 
        Congressional Space Medal of Honor, and the NASA Distinguished Service 
        Medal: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives celebrates the life and 
achievements of Neil A. Armstrong, a United States patriot who humbly 
and selflessly served his country, State, and community as a naval 
aviator, test pilot, astronaut, aeronautical engineer, university 
professor, and businessman.
                                 <all>