Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/10/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/10/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/12/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/12/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/19/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 09/19/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/19/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/19/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/19/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/19/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/21/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/21/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/28/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/28/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/09/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/09/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/09/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/09/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/09/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/09/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/15/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/15/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/15/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/15/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/07/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/07/2012