Text: H.Res.713 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/2012)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 112th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 713 Introduced in House (IH)]

112th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 713

  Expressing support for the XIX International AIDS Conference (AIDS 
  2012) and the sense of the House of Representatives that continued 
 commitment by the United States to HIV/AIDS research, prevention, and 
       treatment programs is crucial to protecting global health.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             June 28, 2012

 Mr. Hastings of Florida submitted the following resolution; which was 
 referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the 
   Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently 
   determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such 
 provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
  Expressing support for the XIX International AIDS Conference (AIDS 
  2012) and the sense of the House of Representatives that continued 
 commitment by the United States to HIV/AIDS research, prevention, and 
       treatment programs is crucial to protecting global health.

Whereas there are currently 33,400,000 people living with HIV/AIDS worldwide, 
        and more than 25,000,000 have died of AIDS since the first cases were 
        reported in 1981;
Whereas in the United States, more than 1,000,000 people are living with HIV/
        AIDS and approximately 50,000 individuals become newly infected with the 
        virus each year;
Whereas 1 in 5 individuals living with HIV is unaware of their infection, 
        underscoring the need for greater education about HIV/AIDS and access to 
        testing;
Whereas significant disparities persist across diverse communities and 
        populations with regard to incidence, access to treatment, and health 
        outcomes, particularly for men who have sex with men (MSM), racial and 
        ethnic minorities, women, and young people;
Whereas societal stigma remains a significant challenge to addressing HIV/AIDS;
Whereas the United States is heavily engaged in both international and domestic 
        efforts to address the HIV/AIDS pandemic, including the President's 
        Emergency Plan for AIDS Relief (PEPFAR), the Global Fund to Fight AIDS, 
        Tuberculosis (TB), and Malaria, the Ryan White Comprehensive AIDS 
        Resources Emergency (CARE) Act, the AIDS Drug Assistance Program (ADAP), 
        the Housing Opportunities for People With AIDS (HOPWA) Program, and AIDS 
        research at the National Institutes of Health (NIH);
Whereas since 1985, the now biennial International AIDS Conference has brought 
        together the world's leading scientists, public health experts, 
        policymakers, community leaders, and persons living with HIV/AIDS in 
        order to address the major issues facing the global response to HIV/
        AIDS, evaluate recent scientific developments and share knowledge, and 
        facilitate a collective strategy forward;
Whereas 25 years after the III International AIDS Conference was held in 
        Washington, DC, AIDS 2012 will take place from July 22, 2012, through 
        July 27, 2012, at the Walter E. Washington Convention Center;
Whereas the return of the International AIDS Conference to Washington, DC, 
        represents a significant victory for public health and human rights, 
        following the end of the United States misguided HIV travel and 
        immigration ban on January 4, 2010, after more than 20 years of advocacy 
        by activists;
Whereas AIDS 2012, organized by the International AIDS Society (IAS), is 
        expected to convene more than 20,000 delegates from nearly 200 
        countries, including 2,000 journalists;
Whereas the theme of AIDS 2012, ``Turning the Tide Together'', embodies both the 
        promise and urgency of utilizing recent scientific advances in HIV/AIDS 
        treatment and biomedical prevention, continuing research for a HIV 
        vaccine and cure, and scaling up effective, evidence-based interventions 
        in key settings in order to change the course of the HIV/AIDS crisis;
Whereas AIDS 2012 seeks to engage governments, nongovernmental organizations 
        (NGOs), policymakers, the scientific community, the private sector, 
        civil society, the media, and people living with HIV/AIDS to more 
        effectively address regional, national, and local responses to HIV/AIDS 
        around the world and overcome barriers that limit access to prevention, 
        care, and services; and
Whereas AIDS 2012 is a tremendous opportunity to further strengthen the role of 
        the United States in global HIV/AIDS initiatives, re-energize the 
        response to the domestic epidemic within the current context of 
        significant global economic challenges, and focus particular attention 
        on the devastating impact that HIV is having on different communities 
        across the country: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) supports the XIX International AIDS Conference, and the 
        goal of bringing renewed awareness of, and commitment to, 
        addressing the HIV/AIDS crisis in the United States and abroad;
            (2) recognizes that continued commitment by the United 
        States to HIV/AIDS research, prevention, and treatment programs 
        is crucial to protecting global health, and that formulating 
        sound public health policy, protecting human rights, advancing 
        sexual and reproductive health and rights, addressing stigma, 
        poverty, and other societal challenges, and ensuring 
        accountability are key to overcoming HIV/AIDS;
            (3) seeks to work with all stakeholders to prevent the 
        transmission of HIV, increase access to testing, treatment, and 
        care, improve health outcomes for all people living with HIV/
        AIDS, and foster greater scientific and programmatic 
        collaborations around the world in order to translate 
        scientific advances and apply best practices to the 
        international community's efforts to end HIV/AIDS;
            (4) commits to helping support a stronger global response 
        to HIV/AIDS, protecting the rights of people living with HIV/
        AIDS, and creating an ``AIDS-free generation''; and
            (5) encourages the ongoing development of innovative 
        therapies and advances in clinical treatment for HIV/AIDS in 
        the public and private sectors, including new and improved 
        biomedical and behavioral prevention strategies, safer, more 
        affordable, more accessible, and effective treatment regimens 
        for infected individuals and pre-exposure prophylaxis, and 
        research for a HIV vaccine and cure.
                                 <all>