Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/09/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/09/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/09/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/09/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/09/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/09/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/09/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/09/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/09/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/09/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/09/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/10/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/12/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/17/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/17/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/17/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/17/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/19/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/24/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/24/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/24/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/24/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/24/2012