Text: H.Res.709 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/2012)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 112th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 709 Introduced in House (IH)]

112th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 709

  Welcoming His Holiness, Hadhrat Mirza Masroor Ahmad, the worldwide 
spiritual and administrative head of the Ahmadiyya Muslim Community, to 
Washington, DC, and recognizing his commitment to world peace, justice, 
      nonviolence, human rights, religious freedom, and democracy.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             June 27, 2012

 Ms. Zoe Lofgren of California (for herself, Mr. Sherman, Mr. Connolly 
 of Virginia, Mr. Hinchey, Ms. Eshoo, Ms. Speier, Ms. Richardson, Mr. 
Schiff, Ms. Schakowsky, Mr. Honda, Mr. Wolf, Mr. Peters, Mr. Dent, Ms. 
 Chu, Mr. Berman, Mr. Franks of Arizona, Ms. Jackson Lee of Texas, Ms. 
Schwartz, Mr. Braley of Iowa, and Mr. McGovern) submitted the following 
   resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
  Welcoming His Holiness, Hadhrat Mirza Masroor Ahmad, the worldwide 
spiritual and administrative head of the Ahmadiyya Muslim Community, to 
Washington, DC, and recognizing his commitment to world peace, justice, 
      nonviolence, human rights, religious freedom, and democracy.

Whereas, from June 16, 2012, to July 2, 2012, His Holiness, Hadhrat Mirza 
        Masroor Ahmad, the worldwide spiritual and administrative head of the 
        Ahmadiyya Muslim Community, an international religious organization with 
        millions of members across the globe, is making a historic visit to the 
        United States;
Whereas His Holiness was elected to become fifth Khalifa to Mirza Ghulam Ahmad, 
        a lifelong position, on April 22, 2003;
Whereas His Holiness is a leading Muslim figure promoting peace, who in his 
        sermons, lectures, books, and personal meetings has continually 
        advocated the Ahmadiyya values of service to humanity, universal human 
        rights, and a peaceful and just society;
Whereas the Ahmadiyya Muslim Community has suffered repeated hardships, 
        including discrimination, persecution, and violence;
Whereas, on May 28, 2010, 86 Ahmadi Muslims were killed in Lahore, Pakistan, 
        when two mosques belonging to the Ahmadiyya Muslim Community were 
        attacked by anti-Ahmadiyya terrorists;
Whereas despite the continued sectarian persecution that Ahmadi Muslims are 
        subjected to, His Holiness continues to forbid violence;
Whereas His Holiness has traveled globally to promote and facilitate service to 
        humanity, meeting with presidents, prime ministers, parliamentarians, 
        and ambassadors of state;
Whereas during his visit to the United States, His Holiness will meet thousands 
        of American Muslims in addition to significant United States Government 
        leaders in order to strengthen relationships and find means of 
        establishing peace and justice for all people; and
Whereas, on the morning of June 27, 2012, His Holiness will deliver the keynote 
        address at a special bipartisan reception at the Rayburn House Office 
        Building on Capitol Hill, ``The Path to Peace: Just Relations Between 
        Nations'': Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) welcomes His Holiness, Mirza Masroor Ahmad to 
        Washington, DC;
            (2) commends His Holiness for promoting individual and 
        world peace, as well as individual and world justice; and
            (3) commends His Holiness for his perseverance in 
        counseling Ahmadi Muslims to eschew any form of violence, even 
        in the face of severe persecution.
                                 <all>