Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/15/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/21/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/21/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/26/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/23/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2012