Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/18/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/25/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/25/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/25/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/25/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/05/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/05/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/05/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/05/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/05/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/05/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/05/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/05/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/06/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/06/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/12/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/12/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/12/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/12/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/12/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/12/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/21/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/09/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/26/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/26/2012