Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/24/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/24/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/24/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/07/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/17/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/07/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/07/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/12/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/15/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/15/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/20/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/20/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/20/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/20/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/25/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 06/25/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/25/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/28/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/09/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/12/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/12/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/25/2012