Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/16/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/16/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/18/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/18/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/24/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/24/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/25/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/25/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/07/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/30/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/30/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/30/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/30/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/30/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/30/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/01/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/05/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/06/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/06/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/06/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/06/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/06/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/07/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/07/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/19/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/21/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/21/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/28/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/28/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/28/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/28/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/11/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/31/2012