Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/16/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/25/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/25/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/01/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/18/2012