Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/18/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/18/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/18/2012