Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/08/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/23/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/04/2011