Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/08/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/11/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/17/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/17/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/17/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/18/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/02/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 03/02/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/02/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/02/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/02/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/02/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/02/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/08/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/10/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/10/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/11/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/15/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/02/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/11/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/23/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/23/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 05/23/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/23/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/31/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/31/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/31/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/06/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/13/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/25/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/25/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/01/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/23/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/21/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/04/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/23/2012