Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/20/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/20/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/20/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/26/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2012