Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/13/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/16/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/16/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/16/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/16/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/16/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/16/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/16/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/16/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/19/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/20/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/20/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/20/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/20/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/20/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/20/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/21/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/21/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/22/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/22/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/22/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/22/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/22/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/26/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/26/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/27/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/16/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/18/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/19/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 04/25/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/07/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/30/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/30/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/05/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/01/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2012