Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/06/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/06/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/26/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/12/2012