Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/27/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/27/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/27/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/28/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/28/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/28/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/01/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/08/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/08/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/08/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/20/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/17/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/13/2012