Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/24/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/08/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/13/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/24/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/24/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 02/29/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/01/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/05/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/09/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2012
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/19/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/21/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/28/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/28/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/16/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/25/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/25/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/25/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/15/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/10/2012