Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/10/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/10/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/10/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/10/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 01/10/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/13/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 01/13/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/13/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/13/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/13/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/13/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/13/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/13/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/13/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/13/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/13/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/13/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/13/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/13/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/13/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/13/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/13/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/13/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/13/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/13/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/13/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/13/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/13/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/17/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/17/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/17/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/17/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/18/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/18/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/23/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/23/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/24/2012
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 01/24/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/03/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/06/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/20/2012