Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 12/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 12/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 12/15/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/15/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/15/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/15/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/15/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/15/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/15/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 12/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 12/15/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/15/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/15/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/15/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 12/15/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/15/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/19/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/19/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/27/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/27/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 12/27/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/27/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/23/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/05/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/05/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/05/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/16/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/16/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/16/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/16/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/16/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/16/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/16/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/08/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/08/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/29/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/29/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/01/2012