Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 11/29/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/30/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/30/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/30/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/30/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 11/30/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/30/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/30/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/30/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/30/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/30/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 12/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/05/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/05/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/06/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 12/06/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/06/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/07/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/12/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 12/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 12/15/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/20/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/13/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/13/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/17/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/27/2012