Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/15/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/15/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/15/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/15/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/18/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/18/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/02/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/02/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/02/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 12/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/14/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/14/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/14/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/19/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/17/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/17/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/17/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/24/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/24/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/24/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/24/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/24/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/01/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/01/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/01/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/07/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/07/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/07/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/07/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/15/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/15/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/15/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/15/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/13/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/13/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/13/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/13/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/13/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/13/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/25/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 05/15/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/19/2012